WORRALL MALE VOICE CHOIR
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Singing group giving pleasure to old people's organisations, hospitals and open concerts to local churches and the public to promote male voice choral music. We are happy to assist local churches or groups in fund raising activities. We will consider any community project in the Sheffield area. We also are regular providers of singing at weddings etc.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dinas Sheffield
- Gogledd Swydd Gaerefrog
Llywodraethu
- 08 Medi 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1185933 WORRALL MALE VOICE CHOIR MUSICAL GRANTS FOUNDATION
- 11 Ebrill 1984: Cofrestrwyd
- 08 Medi 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £14.44k | £38.92k | £10.80k | £8.26k | £19.63k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £15.84k | £15.64k | £18.36k | £18.97k | £12.39k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £1.25k | £1.60k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 19 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 01 Mawrth 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 27 Chwefror 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 5 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 06 AUGUST 1990, 20 FEBRUARY 1995, 10 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2017 as amended on 05 Apr 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF SINGING BY ASSISTING IN, AND TAKING PART IN, CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES AND RAISING FUNDS FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR ORGANISATIONS FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2.2 SUBJECT TO 2.1 ABOVE, ANY SURPLUS INCOME MAY BE APPLIED IN ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window