Dogfen lywodraethu LOCAL SOLUTIONS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2012 as amended on 09 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.1 The Charity’s objects (“the Objects”) are 1.1.1 to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community, and in particular the advancement of education, the furtherance of health, the relief of poverty, distress and sickness, charitable regeneration by the maintenance or improvement of the physical, social and economic infrastructure and the provision of facilities in the interests of education, social welfare, recreation or other leisure time occupation, with the object of improving conditions of life by empowering individuals and supporting communities in England and Wales; 1.1.2 to promote and organise co-operation in the achievement of the above purposes and to that end to bring together representatives of the statutory authorities, local councils and voluntary organisations engaged in the furtherance of the above purposes within England and Wales.
Maes buddion
NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND, NORTH EAST WALES AND MERSEYSIDE IN PARTICULAR
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.