Dogfen lywodraethu THE WOLVERHAMPTON GRAND THEATRE (1982) LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUN 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 FEB 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 OCT 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 NOV 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 OCT 2016 as amended on 07 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THERFOR PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.