Trosolwg o’r elusen THE SAMARITANS OF NORTHUMBRIA
Rhif yr elusen: 219432-39
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/06/1983
AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2001
AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2004
AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2006
AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS ON NORTHUMBRIA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO THE AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OF PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2. TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITAN
Maes buddion
NORHUMBRIA
Hanes cofrestru
- 29 Mawrth 2017: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 219432 SAMARITANS
- 15 Mehefin 1984: Cofrestrwyd
- 29 Mawrth 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- 02 Gorffenaf 2017: Re-registered
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.