DIDSBURY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The organisation and running od Didsbury Festival annually. This is a community event where local charites run stalls to raise funds for their own use. There is a parade through the village by local schools and an arena with events going on all day. The festival is free to the public.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Dinas Manceinion
Llywodraethu
- 10 Mehefin 2016: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1156857 DIDSBURY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- 22 Mehefin 1984: Cofrestrwyd
- 10 Mehefin 2016: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £7.57k | £4.30k | £9.17k | £11.95k | £12.91k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £5.94k | £5.48k | £5.86k | £8.65k | £7.70k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2013 | 06 Ionawr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2013 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2012 | 11 Rhagfyr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2012 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 1984
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DIDSBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OF OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANE THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Maes buddion
DIDSBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window