ELEVATE FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
1. To act as a resource in Christchurch and surrounding areas in Dorset and Hampshire by providing advice, assistance and helping children and young people from the ages of 3 years to 25 years. This will be done through: a) The provision of recreational and leisure activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life, in particular but not
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Llywodraethu
- 02 Ionawr 2025: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1120017 Relationship and Family Therapy (RAFT) Ltd
- 17 Mehefin 2020: CIO registration
- 02 Ionawr 2025: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
- HELPING YOUNG MINDS (Enw blaenorol)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/11/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £5.79k | £27.01k | £61.17k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.21k | £9.95k | £50.69k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 10 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 10 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 31 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
31 Rhagfyr 2022
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
31 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Tachwedd 2021 | 16 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Tachwedd 2021 | 16 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jun 2020 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.TO ACT AS A RESOURCE IN CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN DORSET AND HAMPSHIRE BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AGES OF 3 YEARS TO 25 YEARS. THIS WILL BE DONE THROUGH: A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE TO DANCE, ART, THEATRE, FITNESS AND OTHER OUTDOOR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2.TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY POOR MENTAL HEALTH, IN CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN DORSET AND HAMPSHIRE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A)WORKING WITH SPECIALIST AGENCIES AND MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONALS TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING AND RELATED MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT; B)RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION TO PEOPLE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH ILLNESSES AND WAYS TO MAINTAIN GOOD MENTAL HEALTH; AND TO FURTHER BOTH PURPOSES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window