UK PARANORMAL SOCIETY
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The UK Paranormal Society aims to inform, educate and protect the public and heritage locations who are affected by or interested in the subject of the paranormal; and those practising in the paranormal field. To achieve this, we will provide a source of reliable information and guidance; promote good ethical practices; raise awareness of scientific research and encourage further research.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.29k | £1.39k | £3.25k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.17k | £1.30k | £2.28k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 01 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 01 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 29 Ebrill 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 29 Ebrill 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 29 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 29 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) The protection of the public, particularly those who are vulnerable, from harm caused by misinformation, malpractice and exploitation relating to the paranormal. This will be achieved, in particular but not exclusively, by: a) the provision of appropriate information and guidance to help inform and protect the public; b) the promotion of ethical standards of conduct for paranormal practitioners who are providing paranormal-related services, help or support to members of the public in the UK; and c) promoting and raising awareness of scientific research into the subject of the paranormal by raising public awareness of existing scientific research and encouraging additional scientific research into the subject. 2) For the public benefit, the preservation and protection of heritage locations and their history from harm caused by misinformation, malpractice and exploitation relating to the paranormal. This will be achieved, in particular but not exclusively, by: a) the provision of appropriate information and guidance in the use of heritage locations for paranormal-related purposes; b) the promotion of ethical standards of conduct for paranormal practitioners who are accessing, using or interacting with heritage locations in the UK, for paranormal-related purposes; and c) promoting and raising awareness of scientific research into the subject of the paranormal by raising public awareness of existing scientific research and encouraging additional scientific research into the subject.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window