Dogfen lywodraethu HOSPICE OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 AUGUST 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 DEC 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2016 as amended on 07 Jul 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS AND SUFFERING, ESPECIALLY OF THE DYING, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 3.2 TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS ENGAGED IN PALLIATIVE CARE AND INCREASE AWARENESS AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE VALUES, PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF HOSPICE AND PALLIATIVE CARE
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.