Dogfen lywodraethu LIFELINE PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/08/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUL 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THOSE PERSONS AFFECTED OR WHO SUFFER FROM: 3.1.1 THE ADDICTION TO DRUGS OF ANY KIND; 3.1.2 POOR MENTAL, EMOTIONAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH; 3.1.3 OBESITY AND 3.1.4 SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) HIV AND AIDS 3.2 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE PREVENTION, EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT AND TREATMENT OF DRUG MISUSE, POOR MENTAL EMOTIONAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH, OBESITY AND SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES, AND 3.3 TO SUPPORT AND ASSISTS INDIVIDUALS WITH THEIR REHABILITATION FROM OFFENDING WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTING OR REDUCING THE RISK OF FURTHER CRIME
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.