DEVON BUSINESS & EDUCATION TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To provide the relief of unemployment To promote the education of people and the preservation of mental health To provide assistance to families in need To promote social inclusion To advance such other charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the charity trustees see fit from time to time.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £2,700 o 1 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
5 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Dyfnaint
- Gwlad Yr Haf
Llywodraethu
- 28 Awst 2020: CIO registration
Dim enwau eraill
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Dominic Lorimer | Cadeirydd | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Law | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sue Shelbourne | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Margaret Lorimer | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Iles | Ymddiriedolwr | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Cristina De Aguiar Fazendeiro Wright | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £11.28k | £19.70k | £7.20k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £9.48k | £12.76k | £10.85k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £2.70k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 05 Gorffennaf 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 05 Gorffennaf 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 23 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 23 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 26 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 12 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (I) FACILITATING WORKSHOPS, TUTORING, MENTORING AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS WHICH THEY ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO ACCESS THROUGH THE MAINSTREAM EDUCATION SYSTEM, SO THAT THEY MAY GAIN THE SKILLS AND QUALIFICATIONS THEY NEED, WHERE THEIR EDUCATIONAL PROGRESS HAS BEEN ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY THE IMPACT OF THE COVID-19 PANDEMIC, RELATIONSHIP BREAKDOWN, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BEREAVEMENT, OR WHERE THE PERSON HAS SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS; (II) FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF BUSINESS SKILLS TRAINING, COACHING, MENTORING AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WHO WISH TO BECOME SELF-EMPLOYED AND/OR START A NEW BUSINESS, CO-OPERATIVE OR SOCIAL ENTERPRISE AS A MEANS OF RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS; (III) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY. (C) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY FACILITATING EDUCATION, SKILLS TRAINING, PRACTICAL ADVICE, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS OPPORTUNITIES AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO HELP IMPROVE THEIR MENTAL HEALTH. (D) TO RELIEVE FAMILIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF RELATIONSHIP GUIDANCE, COACHING OR MENTORING TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY RELATIONSHIP. (E) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ÆSOCIALLY EXCLUDEDÆ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY AND/OR AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). (F) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
DEVON BUSINESS & EDUCATION CENTRE
LOWER TALE
PAYHEMBURY
HONITON
EX14 3HL
- Ffôn:
- 01884220150
- E-bost:
- info@dbec.co.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window