Dogfen lywodraethu KOKNI MUSLIM ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 JAN 1983 AS AMENDED ON 06 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2017 as amended on 25 Feb 2018 as amended on 10 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO DEVELOP AS ISLAMIC CENTRE TO PROVIDE ADVANCEMENT AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE HOLY PROPHET (PBUH) 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUTH AND ADULTS 3. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OF ABLE AND DISABLED PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WHICH IMPROVES THE QUALITY OF LIFE 4. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS
Maes buddion
BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.