Dogfen lywodraethu PATH (YORKSHIRE) LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 MARCH 1992, 17 APRIL 2002 AND 5 JULY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING, SKILLS AND EMPLOYMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED, OR MAY SUFFER, DISADVANTAGE BY REASON OF THEIR COLOUR, RACE OR NATIONALITY OR BY REASON OF ANY OF THE CHARACTERISTICS AS DEFINED BY THE EQUALITY ACT 2010, OR WHERE THEIR SOCIO-ECONOMIC STATUS MAY HINDER EDUCATIONAL, LEARNING OR EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WEST YORKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.