Dogfen lywodraethu LEEDS FESTIVAL CHORUS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MAY 22 1985 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 1985, 21 MAY 1986, 15 JULY 1987, 19 JULY 2000 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 26TH JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2018 as amended on 18 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity shall be: to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public events.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.