Dogfen lywodraethu THE URSULA KEYES TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/12/1985 AS AMENDED ON 10/08/2005 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUL 2016 as amended on 27 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS FROM TIME TO TIME OF THE AREA ADMINISTERED BY THE CHESTER DISTRICT COUNCIL (IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE FORMER CHESTER CITY AND THE PARISHES OF GREAT BOUGHTON AND UPTON) AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.2. THE DISSEMINATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE SKILLS AND THE CARE OR TREATMENT OF PATIENTS WHETHER IN PUBLIC OR PRIVATE HOSPITALS OR NURSING HOMES (INCLUDING HOSPICES) OR IN THEIR OWN HOMES.
Maes buddion
PRIMARILY CHESTER DISTRICT COUNCIL ADMINISTRATIVE AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.