Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRIDGE PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/09/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2016 as amended on 08 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To relieve sickness, poverty and promote social inclusion through the provision of treatment, care, rehabilitation, education, training services, social housing, and housing support, to persons or members of their families who: • Have been, or are, or are in danger of becoming substance misusers. • Have committed or are likely to commit crime. • Have been, or are, or are in danger of experiencing mental health conditions. • Have been, or are, or are in danger of becoming homeless. • Have been, or are, or are in danger of experiencing marginalisation, discrimination or social exclusion.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.