Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF CEREDIGION YOUNG MUSICIANS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 1986 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 8 MARCH 1999, AMENDED 14 FEBRUARY 2000 null as amended on 28 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AGED 25 YEARS AND UNDER WHO ARE EITHER PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS ADMINISTERED BY CYNGOR SIR CEREDIGION COUNTY COUNCIL (THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) OR STUDENTS FORMERLY FROM CEREDIGION SCHOOLS PURSUING MUSIC COURSES AT SPECIALIST MUSIC SCHOOLS OR FURTHER EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AMENITIES OR ASSISTANCE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED OR ADEQUATELY PROVIDED BY THE LEA.
Maes buddion
CEREDIGION
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.