Dogfen lywodraethu ECCLESFIELD PRIORY PLAYERS
Rhif yr elusen: 518074
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTED ADOPTED 22 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED 6 JUNE 2007, 5 MARCH 2008 AND 3 MARCH 2010 as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA, AND IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THAT ART.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.