Dogfen lywodraethu MILITIA IMMACULATAE
Rhif yr elusen: 518156

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 1552 diwrnod
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 MARCH 1986, AS AMENDED 28 AUGUST 1986, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 13 JUNE 1998, RESOLUTION AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 14 JUNE 1998 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 15 JUNE 1998.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND ROMAN CATHOLIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, SO THAT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH MAY BE PROPAGATED.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LEICESTERSHIRE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.