Dogfen lywodraethu OLDHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 518255
Up to date (83 days late)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 13/06/1983 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/1986 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2012 as amended on 24 Jun 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.