Dogfen lywodraethu THE WEST MIDLANDS EXAMINATIONS BOARD
Rhif yr elusen: 518419

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 DECEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 DECEMBER 1986, 19 MARCH 1991,17 MARCH 1992 AND 11 MARCH 1998.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING, SUPPORTING AND MAINTAINING A REGIONAL EXAMINATIONS BOARD THROUGHOUT THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.