Elusennau cysylltiedig FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER
Rhif yr elusen: 1195675

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
FOUNDED UNDER ROYAL PATRONAGE IN 1927 SEE COPY APPEAL DATED 1928, AS ALTERED BY CONSTITUTION OF 17 JANUARY 1976, REVISED BY CONSTITUTIONS OF 22 JULY 1981, 21 MAY 1990, 29 JUNE 1991 AND 12 DECEMBER 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY ASSISTING IN THE SUPPORT OF THE CATHEDRAL AND METROPOLITICAL CHURCH OF ST PETER IN YORK (THE MINSTER)BY CONTRIBUTING BOTH FINANCIALLY AND IN OTHER APPROPRIATE WAYS TO ITS PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, BEAUTIFICATION AND MINISTRY.
Maes buddion
YORK.
Hanes cofrestru
- 08 Chwefror 1966 : Cofrestrwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.