Dogfen lywodraethu CHASEWATER LIGHT RAILWAY AND MUSEUM COMPANY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1986, 21 FEBRUARY 1987, 08 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 6 MAY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO PROMOTE AND TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE RAILWAY AND GENERAL TRANSPORT HERITAGE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO INDUSTRIAL AND LIGHT RAILWAYS AND WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA; BY THE CREATION AND OPERATION OF MUSEUMS OF ALL TYPES AND, IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, BY THE CREATION AND OPERATION OF RAILWAYS, TRAMWAYS, OR OTHER FORMS OF TRANSPORT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.