Dogfen lywodraethu ABANDONED ANIMALS ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1987 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/1991 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/05/2013 as amended on 11 Feb 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE CARE ACCOMODATION FOSTERING AND VETERINARY SERVICES WITHIN THE AREA OF NORTH WALES FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS MALTREATMENT AND ABANDONMENT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE AND WELFARE OF ANIMALS.
Maes buddion
AREA OF NORTH WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.