BISHOP P. A. NOEL CHARITY

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We Support Education, Alleviate Financial Hardship, and Enhance General Well-being of Grenadians of African and Indo-Caribbean descent residing in Grenada. We support people of African Caribbean descent in the UK and from all Caribbean countries residing in England and Wales. We support communities throughout the Caribbean in times of Natural Disaster and Crises.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Grenada
Llywodraethu
- 09 Mawrth 2022: Cofrestrwyd
- Agnita Noel Charity (Enw gwaith)
- BISHOP PRISCILDA A. NOEL CHARITY (Enw gwaith)
- Mother Noel Charity (Enw gwaith)
- Mother Noel Project (Enw gwaith)
- Mother P. A. Noel Charity (Enw gwaith)
- P. A. Noel Charity (Enw gwaith)
- Buddiannau croes
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Watkinson Noel | Cadeirydd | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip D Noel | Ymddiriedolwr | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bonita Benjamin | Ymddiriedolwr | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Dhannie | Ymddiriedolwr | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £7.27k | £2.35k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.41k | £4.36k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 14 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 29 Mawrth 2024 | 58 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN REGION AFFECTED [INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID]. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN AND INDO-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THE TRI- 2 ISLAND STATE OF GRENADA, CARRIACOU AND PETITE MARTINIQUE (GRENADA) RESIDING IN THE UK AND GRENADA INCLUDING PEOPLE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN RESIDING IN THE UK, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY IN THE UK AND GRENADA WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT UP TO AGE 25 YEARS AT SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. 4. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY PERSONS OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN AND INDO-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THE TRI ISLAND STATE OF GRENADA, CARRIACOU AND PETITE MARTINIQUE (GRENADA) RESIDING IN THE UK AND GRENADA INCLUDING PEOPLE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN RESIDING IN THE UK, UP TO AGE 25 YEARS AT SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSON’S: A. SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE, OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION INCLUDES THE STUDY OF A STEM, HUMANITIES OR SOCIAL SCIENCES SUBJECT, MEDICINE, LAW OR FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT. B. GRANTS TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 5. TO ASSIST IN RE-ESTABLISHING EDUCATION SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR COMMUNITIES THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN BY PROVIDING RESOURCES IN RESPONSE TO NATURAL DISASTERS AND CRISIS (E.G. THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TEACHING AND LEARNING MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT). 6. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
32 WHITTON AVENUE EAST
GREENFORD
UB6 0PU
- Ffôn:
- 07869803879
- E-bost:
- p.a.noel.charity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window