BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND SAWBRIDGEWORTH STREET PASTORS

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We are fully trained volunteers from local churches in Bishops Stortford and Sawbridgeworth who care about our community. We visit the town centre , usually on Friday or Saturday nights, in teams of men and women, aiming to care for, listen to, and help people who are out and about in our town, especially those who are vulnerable or at risk of harm.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

7 Ymddiriedolwyr
16 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Hertford
Llywodraethu
- 12 Rhagfyr 2023: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 1141439 BISHOP'S STORTFORD STREET PASTORS
- 15 Mehefin 2022: CIO registration
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
7 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth Tracey | Cadeirydd | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Bates | Ymddiriedolwr | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Victor Townsend | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE MARGARET LEWIS | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul McCafferty | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Ribeiro | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Anne McNeeney | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £2.02k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £6.52k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 12 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 12 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 31 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 31 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION ARE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA OF BISHOPS STORTFORD, SAWBRIDGEWORTH AND BEYOND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AS FOLLOWS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STREET PASTOR LICENCE AGREEMENT WITH THE ASCENSION TRUST THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC PASTORAL CARE SERVICES TO HELP PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND OTHER PUBLIC PLACES, GIVING GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING WHICH ASSIST IN PRESERVING PUBLIC ORDER, AVOID ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AND BY (II) ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ECCLESIASTICAL RELEVANCE TO COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC LIFE, MOBILISING THE CHURCH ECUMENICALLY TO UNITY OF WORSHIP AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY CARRYING OUT THE MISSION AND OUTREACH WORK OF THE GOSPEL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN OUR COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE, THROUGH THE PRACTICAL DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH FORMAL TRAINING, INFORMAL TALKS AND CAPACITY BUILDING IN VOLUNTARY SERVICES, ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND THE STREET PASTOR URBAN TRINITY PRINCIPLE OF CHURCH, POLICE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT WORKING TOGETHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. 5 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE. (TAKEN FROM STANDARD MODEL. CONNECTS TO SECTION ABOVE )
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
St Barnabas Centre
Church Lane
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 4BE
- Ffôn:
- 01279506753
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window