Dogfen lywodraethu CUMBRIA AMENITY TRUST MINING HISTORY SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/10/1979 AS AMENDED ON 14/12/1985 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/1987 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/1988 AS AMENDED ON 09/12/2006 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO EXPLORE, RESEARCH, MAINTAIN ACCESS TO AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF OUR CULTURAL AND INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE THOSE HISTORIC INDUSTRIAL AND ARCHITECTURAL REMAINS AS MAY EXIST IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA, AND ELSEWHERE, IN THE FORM OF MINING AND QUARRYING REMAINS AND RELATED INDUSTRIAL WORKINGS, BOTH ABOVE AND BELOW GROUND. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE INDUSTRIAL HISTORY OF CUMBRIA, AND ELSEWHERE, IN PARTICULAR THE HISTORY OF MINING AND QUARRYING, ALONG WITH THE ASSOCIATED ARCHAEOLOGY, MINERALOGY, AND GEOLOGY.
Maes buddion
CUMBRIA AND ELSEWHERE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.