Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHERN YOUTH VENTURE FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 14 JANUARY 1993, 11 MARCH 1993 AND 30 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 2ND MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31ST MAY 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ASSISTING YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 29 YEARS AND ANY PERSONS UNEMPLOYED OR RESIDENT IN POSTCODES WITHIN A DISADVANTAGED AREAS OF THE NORTH OF ENGLAND AS PERIODICALLY DETERMINED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE INLAND REVENUE WHO ARE OF LIMITED MEANS AND HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 66 YEARS AND ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION TRADE OR OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING THEM WITH APPROPRIATE FACILITIES (SUCH AS LOANS, BUSINESS AND MARKETING ADVICE, OUTFITS, TOOLS OR BOOKS OR PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE EXPENSES) CALCULATED TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING.
Maes buddion
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.