PAIGNTON LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Paignton Lions club was established in 1971. Part of Lions Clubs International, a voluntary organisation of over 44000 Lions Clubs in 193 countries. Total membership is over 1.4 million members. What are we -We are a non-profit making charity. ALL public donations and funds raised are passed straight to good causes.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2024
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
6 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Dyfnaint
Llywodraethu
- 22 Mehefin 2022: CIO registration
- LIONS CLUB OF PAIGNTON (Enw gwaith)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Brian Stone | Cadeirydd | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mary Beasley | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Philip Tozer | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ALLEN ROGERS | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.87k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £6.60k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2024 | 02 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2024 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 11 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2023 | 31 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2023 | 27 Awst 2024 | 119 diwrnod yn hwyr | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: 1.1.1.1 PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 1.1.1.2 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; 1.1.1.3 PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; 1.1.1.4 ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; 1.1.1.5 SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.1.2 PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; 1.1.3 PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; 1.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; 1.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; 1.1.6 PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR 1.1.7 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
54 VICTORIA PARK ROAD
TORQUAY
TQ1 3QJ
- Ffôn:
- 03458338754
- E-bost:
- contact@paigntonlions.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window