Dogfen lywodraethu YOUNG PEOPLE'S TRUST, CARLTON LE MOORLAND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 24TH JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2005, 29 JANUARY 2007, 11 JUNE 2007, 18 JULY 2007 AND 4 AUGUST 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE CARE, EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUTH OF THE PARISH OF CARLTON-LE-MOORLAND WITH THE OBJECT OF FURTHERING THEIR DEVELOPMENT THROUGH LEARNING, SPORT AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUTH.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF CARLTON-LE-MOORLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.