Earth Architecture Lab
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
'earth architecture lab' is committed to the preservation and promotion of earth architecture. By harnessing the timeless wisdom of traditional building techniques and integrating modern innovations, the charity seeks to redefine the narrative surrounding sustainable construction practices with people and in needed places.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Ffrainc
- India
- Irac
- Iran
- Moroco
- Oman
- Sawdi-arabia
- Sbaen
- Yemen
- Yr Aifft
- Yr Eidal
- Yr Emiraethau Arabaidd Unedig
- Yr Iseldiroedd
- Y Swistir
Llywodraethu
- 23 Ionawr 2024: Cofrestrwyd
- DAWAN ECO ARCH LIMITED (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Murray OBE | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Salma Samar Damluji | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Charles Modlen | Ymddiriedolwr | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 OCT 2022 as amended on 24 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION THROUGH ADVANCING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE ON MUD AND EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT THROUGH: THE DEVELOPMENT AND DELIVERY OF A STUDY CENTRE FOR EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ARCHIVE TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN AND PROVIDE PUBLIC ACCESS TO MATERIALS RELATING TO EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND OTHER LEADERS IN THE FIELD OF EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT MUD ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL PAPERS, MODELS, DRAWINGS, PLANS, PHOTOGRAPHS, AND OTHER ARTEFACTS. PROVIDING GRANTS TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO SUPPORT THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF EARTH-BUILT ARCHITECTURE AND ASSOCIATED TRADITIONAL ARTS, ARTEFACTS AND CRAFTS. PROMOTING THE PRACTICE AND IMPLEMENTATION OF EARTH BUILDING AND ARCHITECTURAL RECONSTRUCTION AND RESTORATION OF PROJECTS IN LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
71-75 SHELTON STREET
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Ffôn:
- 07904515359
- E-bost:
- eartharchlab@gmail.com
- Gwefan:
-
eartharchitecturelab.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.