Dogfen lywodraethu OLDHAM BOXING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 APR 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 AUG 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 JUN 2023 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 OCT 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF BOXING; AND 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF OLDHAM IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.