PTSD999
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To relieve the needs, suffering and distress, primarily(but not exclusively), of serving and former personnel of the emergency services, HM Prison services and other such governmental and non governmental agencies and charities as the trustee think fit, who are suffering or at risk of suffering from mental trauma, PTSD, or other mental health conditions through the provision of a listening service
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 12 Mawrth 2024: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau ymgyrchoedd a gweithgaredd gwleidyddol
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Cynnwys siaradwyr allanol mewn digwyddiadau elusennol polisi a gweithdrefnau
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Elsom | Cadeirydd | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Russell | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Trevor John Hermes | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Cook | Ymddiriedolwr | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Peak | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEB 2017 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JUL 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 FEB 2024 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 FEB 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF SERVING AND FORMER PERSONNEL OF THE EMERGENCY SERVICES, HM PRISON SERVICE AND OF SUCH OTHER GOVERNMENTAL AND NON-GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES, ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, WHO ARE SUFFERING OR AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM MENTAL TRAUMA, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER OR OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LISTENING SERVICE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES, DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF MENTAL TRAUMA, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER OR OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS SUFFERED BY THOSE WORKING OR HAVE WORKED, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), FOR THE EMERGENCY SERVICES. IN THIS ARTICLE 1.1 “EMERGENCY SERVICES” MEANS THE FIRE, AMBULANCE, POLICE, COASTGUARD AND SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICES AND ANY OTHER AGENCY OR ORGANISATION (INCLUDING GOVERNMENTAL OR CHARITABLE) THAT PROVIDES THE SAME OR SIMILAR SERVICES AS, OR PROVIDES SUPPORT TO, THE FIRE, AMBULANCE, POLICE, COASTGUARD AND SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICES.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
MAPUS SMITH & LEMMON LLP
30 OLD MARKET
WISBECH
PE13 1NB
- Ffôn:
- 07957252955
- E-bost:
- support@ptsd999.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.