DESMOID AID UK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Desmoid Aid UK is a non-profit charity providing information for patients and their families when they have been diagnosed with Desmoid-type fibromatosis. The charity provides links to information and resources about the disease. We also provide a small grant to help pay for unexpected costs for newly diagnosed patients undergoing treatment.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 05 Mawrth 2024: CIO registration
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqui Black | Cadeirydd | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Langley | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Worthington | Ymddiriedolwr | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Hackett | Ymddiriedolwr | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sloman | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH DESMOID-TYPE FIBROMATOSIS (ALSO KNOWN AS AGGRESSIVE FIBROMATOSIS AND DESMOID TUMOURS) AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF: A. FINANCIAL GRANTS TO PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH DESMOID-TYPE FIBROMATOSIS; B. EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE CARE OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DESMOID TUMOURS; C. ANY OTHER ADDITIONAL SUPPORT TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DESMOID TUMOURS AND RELATED CONDITIONS AS TRUSTEES SEE FIT. THERE IS NO GEOGRAPHICAL LIMITS WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
16
OCKENDEN ROAD
LITTLEHAMPTON
16
OCKENDEN ROAD
BN17 7FH
- Ffôn:
- 07974005676
- E-bost:
- info@desmoidaiduk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.