Dogfen lywodraethu COOKRIDGE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/12/1964 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/2002 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Maes buddion
COOKRIDGE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.