Place Matters CIO
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We enable diverse people and organisations to come together and collaborate within a place to act on the things that matter to them. We share learning and inspiration between places to build a wider movement for change that will enable communities to thrive. We seek to influence local, regional and national systems (government, NHS, funders) to make the changes that communities want to see.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Ireland
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 12 Tachwedd 2024: CIO registration
- PLACE MATTERS (Enw blaenorol)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Cynnwys siaradwyr allanol mewn digwyddiadau elusennol polisi a gweithdrefnau
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Randle | Ymddiriedolwr | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jordan OBE | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME DUNCAN | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Weaver | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2024 as amended on 24 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVENESS OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING ORGANISATIONS, THROUGH: (A) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT SUCH MEMBERS ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (B) PROMOTING OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND, (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION THROUGH CARRYING OUT RESEARCH, DELIVERING TRAINING, SUPPORT SERVICES AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY NETWORK TO ENABLE COMMUNITY-LED OR BASED APPROACHES TO IMPROVE LOCAL NEIGHBOURHOODS AND COMMUNITIES. (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, UNEMPLOYMENT, OR THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE THE ‘VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS TO PROMOTE BODIES WHICH ARE FORMALLY CONSTITUTED, INDEPENDENT OF (CENTRAL AND LOCAL) GOVERNMENT, SELF-GOVERNING, NOT PROFIT DISTRIBUTING, PRIMARILY NON-BUSINESS AND THAT BENEFIT FROM VOLUNTARISM. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
W1W 7LT
- Ffôn:
- 07930207944
- E-bost:
- admin@placematters.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.