ACCESSIBLE LEARNING FOUNDATION LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Accessible Learning Foundation (ALF) provides support for neurodivergent children and adults within primary schools, prisons and the workplace, within England and Wales. This is achieved by funding screening programmes, teacher training, workshops, research and raising awareness by affecting national debate.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 04 Medi 2024: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Dixon | Cadeirydd | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Leigh Armitage | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Francis Hosking | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Claire Elizabeth Dixon | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Bloomfield | Ymddiriedolwr | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JUL 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 SEP 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN NEED BY REASON OF HAVING NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS WITHIN PRIMARY SCHOOLS, PRISONS AND THE WORKPLACE, WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING HELP AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO SUPPORT THEM, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; (A) PROVIDING SERVICES SUCH AS ONLINE SCREENING AND INTERVENTION PROGRAMMES TO PRIMARY SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN AND LEARNING COURSES TO TEACHERS THAT ENABLE THE EARLY IDENTIFICATION AND SUPPORT OF NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS WITHIN THE MAINSTREAM CLASSROOM, (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT OF NEURODIVERGENT PRISONERS BY WAY OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO; SCHEMES AND INITIATIVES, TO INCREASE LITERACY WITHIN PRISONS AND REDUCE REOFFENDING RATES, (C) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE BY SUPPORTING BY WAY OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, GRANTS, FOR ACADEMIC RESEARCH INTO THE FIELD OF NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS AND ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGY, (D) RAISING STANDARDS FOR NEURODIVERGENT CHILDREN, PRISONERS AND EMPLOYEES, BY AFFECTING NATIONAL DEBATE ON NEURODIVERGENT ISSUES WITHIN THE EDUCATION AND PENAL POLICIES OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND CALLING FOR BUSINESSES TO EFFECT REGULAR WHOLE STAFF TRAINING ON SUPPORTING THE NEURODIVERGENT WITHIN THE WORKPLACE.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
19 Frewin Road
LONDON
SW18 3LR
- Ffôn:
- 07884433059
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.