MARCOPOLO700 FOUNDATION LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The purpose of the MarcoPolo700 Foundation is to promote inclusive access to education and digital technologies for Art and Cultural conservation. The Foundation organises events and exhibitions to make cultural heritage accessible to all. The organisation aims to foster intercultural dialogue and mutual understanding on a global level by highlighting shared cultural heritage and history.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Malaysia
- Singapore
- Tsieina
- Twrci
- Yr Eidal
- Yr Emiraethau Arabaidd Unedig
Llywodraethu
- 14 Hydref 2024: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
7 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hak Yung Peter YIP | Cadeirydd | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Alexander PIESSE | Ymddiriedolwr | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
FLORIAN EHRBAR | Ymddiriedolwr | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee G Lam | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Orchard | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Edinmore Gather | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael Adeson | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 OCT 2023 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 SEP 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT THE LIFE OF MARCO POLO, INCLUDING HIS JOURNEY ALONG THE SILK ROAD, HIS LIFE ACHIEVEMENTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS TO WORLD TRADE AND CULTURAL EXCHANGE BY DELIVERING EXHIBITIONS, DISPLAYING ARTEFACTS, DISSEMINATING INFORMATION ONLINE, ASSISTING IN UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY AWARDING GRANTS TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION AT UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE, OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION OR FOR LIVING COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR EDUCATION.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Flat 1
3-7 Walpole Street
LONDON
SW3 4QP
- Ffôn:
- +852 28271162
- E-bost:
- contact@marcopolo700.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.