Dogfen lywodraethu THE THOMAS HOWELL'S EDUCATION FUND FOR NORTH WALES
Rhif yr elusen: 525753

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 7 MARCH 1975 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 6 NOVEMBER 1986 AND 18 DECEMBER 1992. AS AMENDED ON THE 22 FEBRUARY 1996 BY A ,RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 11 AUGUST 2000.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR UNDERGOING EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE DECIDES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NORTH WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.