Dogfen lywodraethu KING'S SCHOOL, MACCLESFIELD
Rhif yr elusen: 525921
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 17 MAY 1879 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 05 JULY 1898, 04 NOVEMBER 1901, 18 OCTOBER 1909, 19 MARCH 1958, 30 MARCH 1967, THE KINGS SCHOOL IN MACCLESFIELD FOUNDATION (MODIFICATION) ORDER DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1986 AND A SCHEME DATED 24 JUNE 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A PUBLIC SECONDARY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS AND BOYS AS DAY SCHOLARS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.