Dogfen lywodraethu THOMAS WHITHAM SIXTH FORM
Rhif yr elusen: 526619

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 1190 diwrnod
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEMES OF 5 MAY 1873, 19 MAY 1899, 1 JANUARY 1909 AND 13 AUGUST 1909, ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT OF 1 JULY 1952 AND A RESOLUTION OF 18 JUNE 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) A DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS. 2) EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR PUPILS OF BURNLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL INTENDING TO ENTER THE TEACHING PROFESSION OR OTHER LIKE INSTITUTION OF HIGHER, INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL INSTRUCTION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.