Dogfen lywodraethu STANTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 526633

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 8 JUNE 1970 AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 1983 AND VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 11 JULY 1994 AND 4 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16TH SEPTEMBER 2004.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF JEWISH CHILDREN IN BOTH SECULAR MATTERS AND ORTHODOX JUDAISM PARTICULARLY THOSE BETWEEN THE AGES OF THREE AND ELEVEN WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDING IN SOUTH MANCHESTER AND NORTH CHESHIRE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SOUTH MANCHESTER AND NORTH CHESHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.