Dogfen lywodraethu THE LIVERPOOL COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 1869 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 APR 1909 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 OCT 1926 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 APR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LIVERPOOL, AND OTHERS, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF LECTURES, SCHOOLS, AND OTHER LIKE MEANS, AN EDUCATION SUITED TO THEIR WANTS UPON THE MOST MODERATE TERMS; AND AT THE SAME TIME TO MAINTAIN INDISSOLUBLY THE CONNECTION BETWEEN SOUND RELIGION AND USEFUL LEARNING, AND FOR THIS PURPOSE INSTRUCTION IN THE DOCTRINES AND DUTIES OF CHRISTIANITY, AS TAUGHT BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, SHALL FOR EVER BE COMMUNICATED, IN COMBINATION WITH LITERARY, SCIENTIFIC, AND COMMERCIAL INFORMATION. PROVIDED NEVERTHELESS THAT NO PUPIL SHALL BE REQUIRED AS A CONDITION OF BEING ADMITTED OR REMAINING AS A PUPIL, TO ATTEND OR ABSTAIN FROM ATTENDING ANY SUNDAY SCHOOL, PLACE OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCE, OR INSTRUCTION IN RELIGIOUS SUBJECTS IN ANY SCHOOL OF THE COLLEGE OR ELSEWHERE; AND THAT THE TIME FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OR FOR ANY LESSON ON A RELIGIOUS SUBJECT SHALL BE CONVENIENTLY ARRANGED FOR THE PURPOSE OF ALLOWING THE WITHDRAWAL OF ANY SCHOLAR THEREFROM; AND THAT REGULATIONS MAY BE MADE BY THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE COLLEGE FOR THE TIME BEING PROVIDING THAT IN ANY ONE OR MORE SCHOOLS OF THE COLLEGE RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION DISTINCTIVE OF ANY PARTICULAR DENOMINATION SHALL NOT BE GIVEN TO ANY PUPIL EXCEPT UPON THE WRITTEN REQUEST OF THE PARENT OR GUARDIAN OF SUCH PUPIL ("THE OBJECTS").
Maes buddion
LIVERPOOL AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.