Dogfen lywodraethu THE LAKELAND ARTS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/12/1982 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/05/1989 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31/07/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF KENDAL, AND THE FORMER COUNTY OF WESTMORLAND AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (B) ANY OTHER PUBLIC CHARITABLE PURPOSES TENDING TO ADVANCE ARTISTIC HISTORICAL OR INTELLECTUAL INTERESTS IN THE SAID AREA WHICH CAN CONVENIENTLY BE PROMOTED IN COMBINATION WITH THE PURPOSE AFORESAID.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.