Dogfen lywodraethu TRENT COLLEGE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/12/1890 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/1928 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 JUN 2017 as amended on 08 Oct 2020 as amended on 08 Oct 2020 as amended on 13 May 2022 as amended on 16 May 2022 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS IN ENGLAND, WALES OR ELSEWHERE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Maes buddion
ENGLAND, WALES OR ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.