Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF THE LAING ART GALLERY
Rhif yr elusen: 528070

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 29 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1991, 22 JUNE 1999 AND 20 JUNE 2000 as amended on 10 Mar 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SUPPORT THE LAING ART GALLERY IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND TO PROMOTE ITS USE AND ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC AS AN ART GALLERY
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.