Dogfen lywodraethu ASHORNE HILL MANAGEMENT COLLEGE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 OCTOBER 1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 MARCH 1986, 13 MARCH 1987, 10 MARCH 2000, 5 JUNE 2001, 19 DECEMBER 2001, 30 MARCH 2006 AND 5 JUNE 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING, IN PARTICULAR THE RAISING OF THE STANDARDS OF MANAGEMENT SKILLS AND TECHNIQUES IN THE IRON AND STEEL INDUSTRY AND ASSOCIATED AND ANCILLARY INDUSTRIES BY THE ORGANISATION AND CONDUCT AT ASHORNE HILL AND ELSEWHERE OF A COLLEGE FOR MANAGEMENT EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.