Dogfen lywodraethu PRIOR PURSGLOVE COLLEGE
Rhif yr elusen: 529507
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 24 JUNE 1885 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 27 APRIL 1910, 6 MARCH 1912, 17 NOVEMBER 1933 AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT SEALED 14 JULY 1971.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS TO BE MAINTAINED IN OR NEAR THE URBAN DISTRICT OF GUISBOROUGH AND TO BE CONDUCTED AS A SECONDARY SCHOOL.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
URBAN DISTRICT OF GUISBOROUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.