Dogfen lywodraethu ASHVILLE COLLEGE
Rhif yr elusen: 529577

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 DECEMBER 1903 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 5 OCTOBER 1964 AND 2 JUNE 1989 AS MODIFIED BY ORDERS OF 26 AUGUST 1977 AND 20 AUGUST 1982, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 6TH JANUARY 2003 AND SCHEME DATED 10 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 DEC 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.