Dogfen lywodraethu HIGHFIELD PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 532262
Up to date (44 days late)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1985, 10 NOVEMBER 1988, 26 NOVEMBER 1992, 1 DECEMBER 1998, 28 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 19 JUNE 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT AND CARRY ON SCHOOLS IN WHICH THEY MAY RECEIVE A SOUND GENERAL EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE PRESTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.