DUKERIES COMPLEX TOY LIBRARY
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To provide access to toys and equipment for loan ( for a small charge),to families and groups to support young children with and without disabilities. We organise 4 play and lending sessions per week during term time. To maintain and extend toys and equipment in the Toy Library to meet children's individual needs.Liase with other professionals and voluntary organisations involved with under fives
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2010
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Nottingham
Llywodraethu
- 28 Ebrill 1988: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Gorffennaf 2011: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £35.89k | £11.24k | £5.28k | £4.79k | £7.06k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £30.04k | £6.27k | £1.85k | £3.48k | £2.60k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2010 | 07 Gorffennaf 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2009 | 12 Mai 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2009 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2008 | 16 Ebrill 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2008 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2007 | 14 Mehefin 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2007 | 07 Gorffennaf 2008 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1987
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, FOR THEIR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SUCH AS THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL OR STIMULATING TOYS, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJEC OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. I) TO ASSIST THE DEVELOPMENT FROM THE EARLIEST AGE OF ALL LOCAL HANDICAPPED CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR DISABILITY THROUGH ALL FORMSOF PLAY ACTIVITY. II) TO LEND CHILDREN THE BEST AVAILABLE TOYS. III) TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR PROFESSIONAL INVOLVEMET IN A VOLUNTARY SERVICE FOR LOCAL CHILDREN.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window